WY HB0093 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-11 - (S) Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-11 - (S) Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the creation of unified school districts; eliminating the pupil enrollment requirement for nonunified school districts; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School unification student count deletion.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-11 | (S) Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW | |
2011-02-11 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Bebout, Coe, Cooper, Jennings and Rothfuss Ayes 5 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-11 | (S09) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-02-09 | (S) Rereferred to S09 | |
2011-02-07 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S04 | |
2011-02-04 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-02-04 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Buchanan, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Davison, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gingery, Goggles, Greear, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kasperik, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Roscoe, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Teeters, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Brechtel, Kroeker, Peasley, Quarberg and Stubson. Excused: Representative(s) Brown, Gay and Miller. Ayes 52 Nays 5 Excused 3 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-31 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Bonner, Botten, Connolly, Davison, Jaggi, McKim, McOmie, Petroff and Shepperson Ayes 9 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-31 | (H06) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Rereferred to H06 | |
2011-01-12 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H04 | |
2011-01-11 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0093.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0093.pdf |