WY HB0092 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Assigned Chapter Number 123
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to game and fish; providing for the issuance of free annual archery licenses as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pioneer archery licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17 Assigned Chapter Number 123
2020-03-17 Governor Signed HEA No. 0065
2020-03-10SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0065
2020-03-10HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0065
2020-03-10 Assigned Number HEA No. 0065
2020-03-10Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2020-03-09Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-06SenateCOW:Passed
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on General File
2020-03-03SenateS06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-02-27SenateIntroduced and Referred to S06 - Travel
2020-02-27SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-26House3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0-0
2020-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-24HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-17HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-17HouseH06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2020-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 56-3-1-0-0
2020-02-07HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-03 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback