WY HB0091 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-6-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-6-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal law; prohibiting enforcement of federal law as specified; providing legislative declaration that Wyoming is not a battlefield; providing definitions; providing penalties; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Restoring constitutional governance act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-6-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-04 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-6-0- (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-04 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-6-0- (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-6-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-09 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2015-01-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2015-01-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-13 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0091.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/HB0091.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0091.pdf |