WY HB0090 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - President Signed HEA No. 0049
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - President Signed HEA No. 0049
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to landowner liability; additional activity for which protection from certain liability is provided; specifying that the inclusion of noncommercial aviation activity does not limit liability for airport operations under the Wyoming Governmental Claims Act; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Recreation liability-activities.
Sponsors
Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Rep. David Blevins [R] | Rep. Kermit Brown [R] | Rep. Thomas Lubnau [R] |
Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Sen. Michael Von Flatern [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - H05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - H05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-21 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0049 |
2013-02-20 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0049 |
2013-02-19 | Assigned Number HEA0049 | |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-14 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-21 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-21 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-18 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-18 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-18 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-17 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-17 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 |
2013-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-07 | Bill Number Assigned |