WY HB0085 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - COW:Failed 8-17-5-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - COW:Failed 8-17-5-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; creating a new endangering children felony; providing a penalty; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Child endangering-controlled substance use while pregnant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - COW:Failed 8-17-5-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-03-04 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 46-13-1-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 46-13-1-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 46-13-1-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 46-13-1-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | COW:Failed 8-17-5-0-0 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-03-04 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-03-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 46-13-1-0-0 |
2022-02-28 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2022-02-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-02-24 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 46-13-1-0-0 |
2022-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-09 | Bill Number Assigned |