WY HB0085 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - 3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - 3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to insurance; creating the state health reinsurance program for the reduction of health insurance costs as specified; levying a premium assessment on insurers; creating an account; providing standards for a state innovation waiver application to the federal government; requiring the adoption of rules; repealing provisions relating to the state health reinsurance program; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State health reinsurance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Amendment adopted 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-2-3-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Amendment adopted 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-2-3-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 13-17-0-0-0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-08 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-04 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 55-2-3-0-0 |
2019-02-01 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-31 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-29 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-24 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-24 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2019-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-07 | Bill Number Assigned |