WY HB0085 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicle excise taxes; requiring a vendor to collect excise tax from vehicle purchasers and remit the tax to the department of revenue; requiring one or both parties to a sale of a vehicle not purchased from a vendor to declare the sales price under penalty of perjury; clarifying that a county treasurer or the department of revenue may file the lien for failure to pay tax due on a vehicle; providing conforming amendments; repealing conflicting provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Motor vehicle sales tax-collection by dealers.
Sponsors
Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Sen. Eli Bebout [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - H03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 42-18-0-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 42-18-0-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2018-02-14 | House | H03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 42-18-0-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-01-31 | Bill Number Assigned |