WY HB0085 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-09 - Chapter No. 190 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-09 - Chapter No. 190 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; providing requirements for motor vehicles overtaking and passing bicycles as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Motor vehicle passing bicycles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-7-2-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-7-2-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 33-25-2-0-0 (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 33-25-2-0-0 (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 33-25-2-0 (Y: 13 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-01-21 - House - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-7-2-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 33-25-2-0-0 (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 33-25-2-0-0 (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 33-25-2-0 (Y: 13 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-01-21 - House - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | Chapter No. 190 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-09 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-09 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0099 | |
2015-03-05 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0099 |
2015-03-04 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0099 |
2015-03-04 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0099 | |
2015-03-04 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 21-7-2-0-0 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-03-02 | Senate | COW Passed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-24 | Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-26 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 33-25-2-0-0 |
2015-01-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-22 | House | COW Passed |
2015-01-21 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-21 | Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2015-01-14 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-12 | Bill Number Assigned |