WY HB0084 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - President Signed HEA No. 0040
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - President Signed HEA No. 0040
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to highways; specifying that requirements for county bridge designs, plans and specifications apply to cities and towns; requiring notice to the department of transportation of a constructed bridge; eliminating department of transportation preapproval of bridge designs, plans and specifications for counties, cities and towns; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Approval of bridge designs, plans and specifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-0-4-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-0-4-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0040 |
2018-03-09 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0040 |
2018-03-08 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0040 | |
2018-03-08 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-03-06 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 56-0-4-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-21 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 60-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-01-31 | Bill Number Assigned |