WY HB0082 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health and safety; requiring an implementation report on medical marijuana; providing for identification of medical conditions that benefit from treatment with medical marijuana; providing for recommendations and a timeline related to implementation of medical marijuana; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Implementation requirements for medical marijuana.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] | Rep. Timothy Hallinan [R] | Rep. William Henderson [R] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] |
Rep. Patrick Sweeney [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Sen. Michael Gierau [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-1-1-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2021-03-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-19 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-1-1-0-0 |
2021-03-19 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-19 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2021-01-27 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-27 | Bill Number Assigned |