WY HB0082 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 156
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to veterans; establishing a skilled nursing facility for veterans and their spouses; specifying that nonveterans may be admitted to the facility; designating administration and operation requirements; authorizing level III design, construction and operation plans and construction; authorizing application for and spending of federal funding; authorizing a loan; providing for a continuous appropriation; providing for repayment of the loan; allowing acceptance of donations and monies; establishing an account; providing for rulemaking; requiring reporting; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans' skilled nursing facility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Adopted HB0082JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Adopted HB0082JC001: 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - Concur:Failed 15-43-2-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-2-3-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28 Assigned Chapter Number 156
2019-02-28 Governor Signed HEA No. 0104
2019-02-26SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0104
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0104
2019-02-25 Assigned Number HEA No. 0104
2019-02-19SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-15HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-15HouseConcur:Failed 15-43-2-0-0
2019-02-14HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-14Senate3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0
2019-02-13Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-12Senate2nd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-11SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-08SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-08SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2019-02-07SenateS08 - Transportation:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2019-02-07SenateS08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2019-01-28SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-24House3rd Reading:Passed 55-2-3-0-0
2019-01-23House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-22HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-18HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-18HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-01-16House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-16HouseH08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0082
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Introduced/HB0082.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Engross/HB0082.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Enroll/HB0082.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Fiscal/HB0082.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0082#-135
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0082#-183
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0082#5092
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0082#-616
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0082#-642
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0082#450
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0082#5355
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0082#5437
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0082#584

Bill Comments

feedback