WY HB0081 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 71 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to court supervised treatment; providing for the assessment of a surcharge for specified offenses to be paid to the court supervised treatment account; authorizing a court to waive the surcharge for good cause; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug court surcharge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07 Chapter No. 71 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-07 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-04 Governor Signed HEA No. 0039
2016-03-03SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0039
2016-03-02HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0039
2016-03-02 Assigned Number HEA No. 0039
2016-03-02Senate3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0
2016-03-01Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-29SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-26SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-26 S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2016-02-23SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-23House3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
2016-02-22House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-19House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2016-02-18HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-15HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-15 H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2016-02-10HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 58-2-0-0-0
2016-02-09HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback