WY HB0081 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-10 - (H) Introduced and Referred to H08;No Report Prior to COW Cutoff; Intro Vote
Pending: Joint Transportation, Highways & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-10 - (H) Introduced and Referred to H08;No Report Prior to COW Cutoff; Intro Vote
Pending: Joint Transportation, Highways & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to transportation; establishing requirements for a railroad contract carrier transporting railroad employees as specified; establishing driver and vehicle requirements; providing definitions; providing a penalty; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Safe transportation of railroad employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-18 - House - Motion to Do Pass Failed (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H08;No Report Prior to COW Cutoff; Intro Vote | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-08 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Digest/HB0081.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Introduced/HB0081.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Digest/HB0081.htm |