WY HB0080 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - 2nd Reading:Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to state lands; requiring the board of land commissioners to provide a process by regulation for a hearing related to the appraisal of lands to be exchanged; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land appraisal appeal process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 53-5-2-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-24HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-20HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-20HouseH05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0
2020-02-10HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 53-5-2-0-0
2020-02-07HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-01-29 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback