WY HB0080 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 87 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Wyoming community college commission; modifying the standard and exception budget request processes for state appropriations for community colleges; requiring a recalibration of the standard budget request as specified; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community college budget request recalibration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 55-5-0-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 55-5-0-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07 Chapter No. 87 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-07 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-04 Governor Signed HEA No. 0029
2016-03-01SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0029
2016-03-01HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0029
2016-03-01 Assigned Number HEA No. 0029
2016-03-01Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-29Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-26SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-26SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-26 S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2016-02-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-23House3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
2016-02-22House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-19House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2016-02-18HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-15HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-12 H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2016-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 55-5-0-0-0
2016-02-09HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback