WY HB0078 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - COW:Failed 9-21-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - COW:Failed 9-21-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public works; amending requirements for letting contracts for public works; requiring a written response for procurement decisions as specified; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Bid rejection or denial for public works contracting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - COW:Failed 9-21-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-01 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-9-1-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-9-1-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | COW:Failed 9-21-0-0-0 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-03-01 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-17 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 50-9-1-0-0 |
2022-02-16 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-15 | House | COW:Passed |
2022-02-15 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-02-15 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 59-0-1-0-0 |
2022-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-08 | Bill Number Assigned |