WY HB0078 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - H:Amend and DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public health; allowing supervised use of plant derived pain medication as specified; providing an exemption from prosecution for possession or use of plant derived pain medication as specified; authorizing a fee for registration; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Plant derived pain medication.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-03 - House - H:Amend and DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4- (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-03 - House - H:Amend and DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5- (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-03 H:Amend and DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-
2015-02-09HouseNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2015-01-16HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2015-01-14HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-12 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback