WY HB0078 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-05 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-05 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; providing for valuation of natural gas as specified; providing definitions; providing legislative findings; providing applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Natural gas-taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - Senate - Motion to Do Pass Failed (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-17 - House - H03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - H03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-05 | (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c) | |
2010-02-25 | Motion to Do Pass Failed | |
2010-02-24 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S03;No Report Prior to COW Cutoff | |
2010-02-24 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-22 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-17 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-17 | (H03) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H03 | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-08 | Bill Number Assigned |