WY HB0077 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on February 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on February 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to school finance; modifying the definition of average daily membership as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School finance-average daily membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-24 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2023-01-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-24 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2023-01-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2023-01-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-04 | Bill Number Assigned |