WY HB0077 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to school district reorganization; providing for the reorganization of school districts as specified; establishing a planning committee; imposing a consolidation planning process; providing for consolidation in the absence of a plan by the planning committee; imposing duties on the state board of education; providing reporting requirements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School district reorganization.
Sponsors
Rep. Landon Brown [R] | Rep. Chuck Gray [R] | Rep. Joe MacGuire [R] | Rep. Clark Stith [R] |
Rep. Sue Wilson [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Sen. Dan Furphy [R] | Sen. Lynn Hutchings [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - House - H04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2021-03-24 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-03-19 | House | H04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2021-01-26 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-21 | Bill Number Assigned |