WY HB0077 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Assigned Chapter Number 21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Assigned Chapter Number 21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to cigarette tax administration; maintaining the current cigarette tax rate; amending the description of the rate; conforming the distribution of the tax; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Cigarette tax administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-8-0-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-8-0-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Assigned Chapter Number 21 | |
2019-02-14 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0007 | |
2019-02-11 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0007 |
2019-02-11 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0007 |
2019-02-08 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0007 | |
2019-02-08 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-04 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-11 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 52-8-0-0-0 |
2019-01-10 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-09 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-09 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-09 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-05 | Bill Number Assigned |