WY HB0077 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - President Signed HEA No. 0115
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to lotteries; creating the Wyoming lottery corporation; providing for membership of the board; providing legislative declarations; providing definitions; providing powers and duties; providing for rules and regulations; providing for use of proceeds; providing limitations on retailers; providing for criminal offenses and penalties; providing for background checks; excluding authorized lottery games from definition of gambling; excluding purchase of lottery tickets from sales and use tax; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming lottery.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-26 - Senate - S Adopted HB0077JC01 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - H Adopted HB0077JC01 (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - H Did Not Concur (Y: 25 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - S06 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-27SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0115
2013-02-27HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0115
2013-02-27 Assigned Number HEA0115
2013-02-26SenateAdopted HB0077JC01
2013-02-26HouseAdopted HB0077JC01
2013-02-25SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2013-02-25HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2013-02-25HouseDid Not Concur
2013-02-22HouseReceived for Concurrence
2013-02-22SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-22 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-22 Amendment Failed
2013-02-22 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-22 Amendment Failed
2013-02-21SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-21 Amendment Failed
2013-02-21 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-21 Amendment Failed
2013-02-21 Amendment Failed
2013-02-21 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-21 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-21 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-21 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-21 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-20SenatePassed CoW
2013-02-20 Amendment Failed
2013-02-20 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-20SenateAmendments Adopted
2013-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2013-02-12SenateRecommended Do Pass
2013-02-05SenateIntroduced and Referred to S06
2013-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-02-04HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-04 Amendment Failed
2013-02-01HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-01 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-31HousePassed CoW
2013-01-31 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-31 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-31HouseAmendments Adopted
2013-01-30HousePlaced on General File
2013-01-30HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-15HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07
2013-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2012-12-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback