WY HB0076 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 163
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 163
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to professions and occupations; removing a requirement that examinations for cosmetology and related licensure be conducted by the state board of cosmetology; reducing the number of practice years required for a license to practice veterinary medicine without an examination; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Licensing boards amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-03 - Senate - Adopted HB0076JC001: 26-1-4-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0076JC001: 43-12-7-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Did Not Adopt HB0076JC001: 0-54-8-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2023-03-03 - House - JCC Report Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 54-0-8-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - Adopted HB0076JC001: 44-13-5-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - Concur:Failed 4-56-2-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-13-1-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-13-1-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0076JC001: 43-12-7-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - Did Not Adopt HB0076JC001: 0-54-8-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2023-03-03 - House - JCC Report Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 54-0-8-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - Adopted HB0076JC001: 44-13-5-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - Concur:Failed 4-56-2-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-13-1-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-13-1-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Assigned Chapter Number 163 | |
2023-03-09 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0093 | |
2023-03-03 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0093 |
2023-03-03 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0093 |
2023-03-03 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0093 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2023-03-01 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2023-03-01 | House | Concur:Failed 4-56-2-0-0 |
2023-03-01 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2023-03-01 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-1-0-0 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-27 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-24 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-26 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 48-13-1-0-0 |
2023-01-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-20 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2023-01-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-04 | Bill Number Assigned |