WY HB0076 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 108
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to alcoholic beverages; authorizing appropriate licensing authorities to issue twenty-four hour malt beverage permits to microbreweries; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming Beer Freedom Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - House - Concur:Passed 51-6-3-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 108
2019-02-26 Governor Signed HEA No. 0041
2019-02-19SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0041
2019-02-19HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0041
2019-02-15 Assigned Number HEA No. 0041
2019-02-15HouseConcur:Passed 51-6-3-0-0
2019-02-14HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-14Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2019-02-13Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-12SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-07SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-07SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2019-01-30SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-29House3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0
2019-01-28House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-25HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-24HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-24HouseH05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-05 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback