WY HB0075 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 56-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 114
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 56-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 114
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; modifying the definition of acceptable identification; requiring that acceptable identification be presented before voting in person; providing that provisional ballots may be cast as specified; providing that in person voters may be challenged for failure to present acceptable identification; modifying requirements of the department of transportation related to identification cards as specified; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Voter identification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Concur:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-9-0-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-9-0-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Assigned Chapter Number 114 | |
2021-04-06 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0072 | |
2021-04-02 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0072 |
2021-04-01 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0072 |
2021-04-01 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0072 | |
2021-04-01 | House | Concur:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 |
2021-04-01 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2021-04-01 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-30 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-03 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 51-9-0-0-0 |
2021-03-02 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-01 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-01 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-01 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2021-01-21 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-20 | Bill Number Assigned |