WY HB0075 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - COW:Failed 3-26-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - COW:Failed 3-26-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal history records; requiring individuals certified by the professional teaching standards board to submit to a criminal history record background check every ten years after initial certification; requiring speech-language pathologists, audiologists and assistants to submit to a criminal history record background check as a condition of licensure; making conforming amendments; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Background check requirements-professional licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - COW:Failed 3-26-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-18-3-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-18-3-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | COW:Failed 3-26-1-0-0 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-06 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 39-18-3-0-0 |
2019-01-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-18 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2019-01-17 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-16 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2019-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-04 | Bill Number Assigned |