WY HB0074 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 79 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 79 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state recognized commemorative days; designating Agent Orange Health Awareness Month; providing recommendations for observation of the month; imposing duties on the Wyoming veterans' commission; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Agent Orange Health Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Chapter No. 79 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-06 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-06 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0045 | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0045 |
2017-02-22 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0045 |
2017-02-22 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0045 | |
2017-02-21 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-09 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-02-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-31 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-30 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-27 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-03 | Bill Number Assigned |