WY HB0074 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chapter No. 34 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chapter No. 34 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicle registration; providing that front license plates need not be displayed on certain vehicles as specified; making a conforming amendment; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Front license plate requirement.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan Blake [D] | Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Rep. Rosie Berger [R] | Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] |
Rep. David Northrup [R] | Sen. Bruce Burns [R] | Sen. Henry Coe [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - Concur:Passed 38-21-1-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - Concur:Passed 38-21-1-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-8-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - Concur:Passed 38-21-1-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-8-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | Chapter No. 34 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-02-25 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0026 | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0026 |
2015-02-20 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0026 |
2015-02-19 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0026 | |
2015-02-19 | House | Concur:Passed 38-21-1-0-0 |
2015-02-18 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2015-02-18 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-12 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-12 | Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-26 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 52-8-0-0-0 |
2015-01-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-21 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-21 | Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2015-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-12 | Bill Number Assigned |