WY HB0074 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 18 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - (H) Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 18 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - (H) Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to marriage; providing that marriages other than of a male and a female person are void; providing that marriages between more than two parties are void;
Title
Validity of marriages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | (H) Indefinitely Postponed | |
2011-03-02 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Cooper, Dockstader, Geis, Hicks, Jennings, Johnson, Meier, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson and Ross. Nays: Senator(s) Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Hastert, Hines, Landen, Martin, Nicholas P, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Ayes 14 Nays 16 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-03-02 | (S) Did Not Adopt HB0074JC01 | |
2011-03-02 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Blikre, Botten, Brechtel, Buchanan, Burkhart, Campbell, Cannady, Davison, Edmonds, Eklund, Gay, Greear, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Jaggi, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, Miller, Peasley, Petersen, Quarberg, Semlek, Shepperson, Stubson and Teeters. Nays: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Bonner, Brown, Byrd, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gingery, Goggles, Greene, Illoway, Kasperik, McOmie, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Petroff, Roscoe, Steward, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Excused: Representative(s) Pederson Ayes 31 Nays 28 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-03-02 | (H) Adopted HB0074JC01 | |
2011-02-23 | (S) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2011-02-22 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Blake, Esquibel, K., Goggles, Madden, Patton and Wallis. Nays: Representative(s) Berger, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brechtel, Brown, Buchanan, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Edmonds, Eklund, Freeman, Gay, Gingery, Greear, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Nicholas B, Peasley, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Roscoe, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Throne, Vranish, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Excused: Representative(s) Davison, Kasperik and Pederson. Ayes 7 Nays 50 Excused 3 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Did Not Concur | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Received for Concurrence | |
2011-02-18 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Cooper, Dockstader, Geis, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Meier, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson and Ross. Nays: Senator(s) Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Hastert, Martin, Nicholas P, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Ayes 16 Nays 14 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-18 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-02-18 | Amendment Failed | |
2011-02-18 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-02-17 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-17 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-02-17 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2011-02-17 | Amendment Failed | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-04 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-04 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Bebout, Driskill, Geis and Hicks Nayes: Senator(s) Emerich Ayes 4 Nays 1 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-04 | (S05) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-02-02 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S05 | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-24 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Blikre, Botten, Brechtel, Buchanan, Burkhart, Campbell, Cannady, Davison, Edmonds, Eklund, Gay, Greear, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Jaggi, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, Miller, Peasley, Petersen, Quarberg, Semlek, Shepperson, Stubson and Teeters. Nays: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Bonner, Brown, Byrd, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gingery, Greene, Illoway, McOmie, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Pederson, Petroff, Roscoe, Steward, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Excused: Representative(s) Goggles Ayes 32 Nays 27 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-24 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-21 | Amendment Failed | |
2011-01-21 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-01-21 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-20 | Amendment Adopted | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-18 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Brechtel, Burkhart, Kroeker, Krone, Loucks, Madden and Teeters Nayes: Representative(s) Connolly and Freeman Ayes 7 Nays 2 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-01-18 | (H04) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-13 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H04 | |
2011-01-11 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-06 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0074.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0074.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Engross/HB0074.pdf |