WY HB0073 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to cities and towns; requiring written approval from a simple majority of all landowners owning a parcel of the land in an area before annexation into a municipality; modifying notice requirements to landowners; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Annexation-vote requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-22-1-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-22-1-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-02-14 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 2-3-0-0-0 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-20 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 39-22-1-0-0 |
2023-01-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-18 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2023-01-17 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-17 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0 |
2023-01-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2023-01-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-03 | Bill Number Assigned |