WY HB0071 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - No report prior to CoW Cutoff
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - No report prior to CoW Cutoff
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to custody and visitation; revising terms; providing definitions; conforming provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Child custody.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 40-20-0-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 40-20-0-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-01-25 | Bill Number Assigned |