WY HB0071 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water development projects; authorizing specified Level I and Level II studies and providing appropriations; requiring reports; providing for reversion of uncontracted funds; authorizing unobligated funds to be used to complete other designated project studies under certain conditions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Omnibus water bill-planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - H05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - H05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2013-02-18 | Governor Signed HEA0039 | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0039 |
2013-02-14 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0039 |
2013-02-14 | Assigned Number HEA0039 | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-28 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-24 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-17 | House | Rereferred to H02 |
2013-01-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-17 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 |
2013-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2012-12-27 | Bill Number Assigned |