WY HB0070 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 94
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the secretary of state; authorizing the secretary of state to develop and implement a blockchain filing system; authorizing the promulgation of rules; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial filing system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - Concur:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-28-1-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 94
2019-02-26 Governor Signed HEA No. 0050
2019-02-20SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0050
2019-02-20HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0050
2019-02-19 Assigned Number HEA No. 0050
2019-02-19HouseConcur:Passed 58-1-1-0-0
2019-02-15HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-15Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-02-14Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-13SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-12SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2019-02-07Senate:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2019-02-07SenateS07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2019-01-30SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-29House3rd Reading:Passed 31-28-1-0-0
2019-01-28House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-25HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-24HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-24HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-01-14House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-14HouseH03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-03 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback