WY HB0070 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - President Signed HEA No. 0027
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - President Signed HEA No. 0027
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to securities; providing that a person who develops, sells or facilitates the exchange of an open blockchain token is not subject to specified securities and money transmission laws; providing specified verification authority to the secretary of state and banking commissioner; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Open blockchain tokens-exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0027 |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0027 |
2018-03-07 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0027 | |
2018-03-07 | House | Concur:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-07 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-28 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-23 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-16 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-15 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-14 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 60-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |