WY HB0070 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to revenue for transportation purposes; increasing vehicle registration fees; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle registration.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-26HouseDied In Committee
2013-02-04HouseIntroduced and referred to H03; No report prior to CoW Cutoff
2013-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03
2013-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2012-12-27 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback