WY HB0069 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; creating an offense for the nonconsensual dissemination of an intimate image; specifying elements of the offense; providing definitions; providing penalties; providing exemptions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Unlawful dissemination of an intimate image.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 32-28-0-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 55-5-0-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 55-5-0-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 | |
2016-02-29 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 32-28-0-0-0 |
2016-02-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2016-02-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-15 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-15 | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 55-5-0-0-0 |
2016-02-05 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-03 | Bill Number Assigned |