WY HB0068 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - H:POSTPONED until July 1, 2016 in Accordance with House Rule 5-4:
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to elections; creating a misdemeanor offense for photographing or otherwise recording an official ballot as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Photographing ballot-penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-03 - House - H:POSTPONED until July 1, 2016 in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - H:POSTPONED until July 1, 2016 in Accordance with House (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-03 H:POSTPONED until July 1, 2016 in Accordance with House Rule 5-4:
2015-02-09HouseNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2015-01-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2015-01-13HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback