WY HB0065 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 134
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the administration of government; modifying provisions relating to the procurement of services by public entities; subjecting school districts to the requirements of the Professional Architectural, Engineering and Land Surveying Services Procurement Act; providing applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procurement amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - House - Concur:Passed 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-3-3-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Assigned Chapter Number 134
2019-02-27 Governor Signed HEA No. 0078
2019-02-25SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0078
2019-02-25HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0078
2019-02-22 Assigned Number HEA No. 0078
2019-02-22HouseConcur:Passed 52-7-1-0-0
2019-02-21HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-21Senate3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0
2019-02-20Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-19SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-15SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-11Senate:Rerefer to S04 - Education
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2019-01-25SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23House3rd Reading:Passed 54-3-3-0-0
2019-01-22House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-18HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-16HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-16HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-03 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback