WY HB0065 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - President Signed HEA No. 0043
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - President Signed HEA No. 0043
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health and safety; creating the municipal solid waste landfill remediation program; creating criteria for the program; creating the municipal solid waste landfill remediation account; providing qualifications for expenditures from the account; providing for reimbursement for the cost of remediation and monitoring activities as specified; providing a definition; providing rulemaking authority; depositing funds into the account; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Municipal solid waste landfill remediation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-15 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - S09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - S09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-21 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0043 |
2013-02-20 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0043 |
2013-02-15 | Assigned Number HEA0043 | |
2013-02-15 | House | Did Concur |
2013-02-14 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-13 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-25 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-25 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-25 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-23 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-23 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-16 | House | Rereferred to H02 |
2013-01-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-16 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 |
2013-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2012-12-26 | Bill Number Assigned |