WY HB0063 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 113
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to regulation of pharmacy benefit managers under the insurance code; providing that a pharmacy benefit manager shall not prohibit or penalize disclosure of prescription cost information or affordable alternatives; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy benefit managers-prescription cost notification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - Concur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 113
2019-02-26 Governor Signed HEA No. 0052
2019-02-20SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0052
2019-02-20HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0052
2019-02-19 Assigned Number HEA No. 0052
2019-02-19HouseConcur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
2019-02-15HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-15Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-02-14Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-13SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-11SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-11SenateS10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2019-02-04SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-01House3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
2019-01-31House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-30HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-28HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-28HouseH10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-03 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback