WY HB0062 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 46
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 46
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to insurance; amending and creating definitions; amending fee schedules and creating new fees; amending licensure requirements for licenses issued by the department of insurance; amending continuing education requirements; repealing requirements related to licenses and continuing education; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Insurance amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-12-1-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 48-11-1-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-12-1-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 48-11-1-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Assigned Chapter Number 46 | |
2022-03-09 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0030 | |
2022-03-07 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0030 |
2022-03-07 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0030 |
2022-03-07 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0030 | |
2022-03-07 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-03-03 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-03-03 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-28 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 47-12-1-0-0 |
2022-02-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-02-17 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 48-11-1-0-0 |
2022-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-03 | Bill Number Assigned |