WY HB0062 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 170
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to property; making legislative findings; establishing that open blockchain tokens with specified consumptive characteristics are intangible personal property and not subject to a securities exemption; providing definitions; requiring developers and sellers of open blockchain tokens to file notices of intent and fees with the secretary of state; authorizing specified enforcement actions; making specified violations unlawful trade practices; repealing provisions granting open blockchain tokens a securities exemption; specifying applicability; providing an appropriation; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming Utility Token Act-property amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - House - Concur:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28 Assigned Chapter Number 170
2019-02-28 Governor Signed HEA No. 0100
2019-02-26SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0100
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0100
2019-02-25 Assigned Number HEA No. 0100
2019-02-25HouseConcur:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
2019-02-22HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2019-02-21Senate3rd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-20Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-19SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-14SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-14SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-12SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2019-02-08SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-08SenateS09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
2019-01-22SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-18House3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0
2019-01-17House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-16HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-16HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-16HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-01-14HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-11HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-11HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-12-31 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback