WY HB0062 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - Motion to Do Pass Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - Motion to Do Pass Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; requiring school districts to report on reading assessment and intervention as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Reading assessment reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-10 - House - Motion to Do Pass Failed (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | Motion to Do Pass Failed | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H04;No Report Prior to COW Cutoff; Intro Vote | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Digest/HB0062.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Introduced/HB0062.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Digest/HB0062.htm |