WY HB0056 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - President Signed HEA No. 0092
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to environmental quality; designating in statute the Wyoming pollution discharge elimination system; providing for submittal of fees for a Wyoming pollution discharge elimination system permit before processing and issuance of the permit; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming pollution discharge elimination system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-25 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-26SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0092
2013-02-25HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0092
2013-02-25 Assigned Number HEA0092
2013-02-25HouseDid Concur
2013-02-22HouseReceived for Concurrence
2013-02-22SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-21SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-20SenatePassed CoW
2013-02-20 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-20SenateAmendments Adopted
2013-01-28SenatePlaced on General File
2013-01-28SenateRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09
2013-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-01-24HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-01-23HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-01-22HousePassed CoW
2013-01-21HousePlaced on General File
2013-01-21HouseRecommended Do Pass
2013-01-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09
2013-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2012-12-17 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback