WY HB0054 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned Chapter Number 44
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned Chapter Number 44
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to agriculture and economic development; amending the duties of the Wyoming business council to require support for Wyoming producers in the agriculture and meat processing industry; expanding permissible loans and grants to Wyoming meat producers and processors; limiting state rulemaking authority related to meat processing; authorizing rulemaking; requiring a report; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Wyoming meat packing initiative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-26 - House - Concur:Passed 53-7-0-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-5-0-0-3 (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-12-1-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-5-0-0-3 (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 47-12-1-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Assigned Chapter Number 44 | |
2021-04-01 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0030 | |
2021-03-30 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0030 |
2021-03-30 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0030 |
2021-03-26 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0030 | |
2021-03-26 | House | Concur:Passed 53-7-0-0-0 |
2021-03-25 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2021-03-25 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 22-5-0-0-3 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-12 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-05 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 47-12-1-0-0 |
2021-03-04 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-03 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-01 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-01 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2021-01-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-08 | Bill Number Assigned |