WY HB0054 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-20 - COW:Failed 20-38-2-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-20 - COW:Failed 20-38-2-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to ad valorem taxation; specifying land that qualifies for classification as agricultural land; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Taxable value of agricultural land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-20 - House - COW:Failed 20-38-2-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-01-19 - House - COW:Failed 20-38-2-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-01-18 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - COW:Failed 20-38-2-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-01-18 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-20 | House | COW:Failed 20-38-2-0-0 |
2017-01-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-18 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-20 | Bill Number Assigned |