WY HB0053 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to criminal procedure and sentencing; establishing an incentives and sanctions system for probation and parole supervision as specified; specifying authorized sanctions; providing a procedure for imposing sanctions; providing definitions; providing for the award of credit against original sentences for parolees; requiring the use of validated risk and need assessments; clarifying requirements for placement in an intensive supervision program; making conforming amendments; specifying applicability; providing rulemaking; repealing obsolete provisions; providing an appropriation; requiring reports; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Probation and parole-incentives and sanctions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - Concur:Passed 33-26-1-0-0 (Y: 33 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 116
2019-02-26 Governor Signed HEA No. 0053
2019-02-20SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0053
2019-02-20HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0053
2019-02-19 Assigned Number HEA No. 0053
2019-02-19HouseConcur:Passed 33-26-1-0-0
2019-02-15HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-15Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-02-14Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-13SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-12SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0
2019-02-08Senate2nd Reading:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2019-02-07SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-06SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-06SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2019-02-06Senate:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2019-02-06SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-01-30SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-29House3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
2019-01-28House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-25HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-24HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-24HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-01-18House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-18HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-12-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback