WY HB0051 | 2012 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - (S) Failed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to impact assistance payments; revising duties of the department of environmental quality and industrial siting division as specified; revising industrial facility permit fees; revising how impact assistance payment amounts are calculated; providing rulemaking authority; repealing conflicting provisions; providing applicability; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial siting impact payments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-07 - Senate - S Failed 3rd Reading (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Amendment Failed (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - Senate - S Passed CoW (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - S03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - H03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H03 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-07 (S) Failed 3rd Reading
2012-03-07 (S) Laid Back Pursuant to SR 10-4(a)
2012-03-06 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-03-06 Amendment Failed
2012-03-06 Amendment Failed
2012-03-06 Amendment Adopted
2012-03-06 Amendment Adopted
2012-03-05 (S) Passed CoW
2012-03-05 Amendment Failed
2012-03-05 Amendment Adopted
2012-03-05 Amendment Adopted
2012-03-05 (S) Amendments Adopted
2012-03-02 (S) Placed on General File
2012-03-02 (S02) Recommended Do Pass
2012-03-01 (S) Rereferred to S02
2012-03-01 (S) Placed on General File
2012-03-01 (S03) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2012-02-28 (S) Introduced and Referred to S03
2012-02-28 (S) Received for Introduction
2012-02-27 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-02-27 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-24 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-02-23 (H) Passed CoW
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-23 (H) Amendments Adopted
2012-02-20 (H) Placed on General File
2012-02-20 (H02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2012-02-17 (H) Rereferred to H02
2012-02-17 (H) Placed on General File
2012-02-17 (H03) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2012-02-15 (H) Introduced and Referred to H03
2012-02-13 (H) Received for Introduction
2012-02-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback