WY HB0049 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-6-1-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-6-1-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to daylight saving time; requiring an application for the state to transfer time zones as specified; establishing a new uniform state time; making legislative findings; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Mountain daylight saving time.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Laursen [R] | Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] | Rep. Robert McKim [R] | Rep. David Miller [R] |
Sen. Cale Case [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Michael Von Flatern [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-6-1- (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-6-1-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-6-1-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 2-6-1- | |
2017-02-03 | House | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-19 | Bill Number Assigned |