WY HB0049 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health; creating the primary care support program; authorizing grants as specified; providing for a local match as specified; requiring reports; providing appropriations; providing a repeal date; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Primary care support program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-25 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 49 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - "(i) Before submission to the department, and following public notice and a hearing, the application shall be approved by the board of county commissioners for the county in which the community health center or rural health clinic is located or proposed t (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - "(i) Before submission to the department, and following public notice and a hearing, the application shall be approved by the board of county commissioners for the county in which the community health center or rural health clinic is located or proposed t (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2011-03-03 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0065 | |
2011-02-28 | (S) President Signed HEA No. 0065 | |
2011-02-28 | (H) Speaker Signed HEA No. 0065 | |
2011-02-25 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0065 | |
2011-02-25 | (H) Did Concur | |
2011-02-24 | (H) Received for Concurrence | |
2011-02-24 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-23 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-22 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-16 | (S02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-02-10 | (S) Rereferred to S02 | |
2011-02-10 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-10 | (S10) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-02-02 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S10 | |
2011-02-02 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Laid Back Pursuant to HR 9-3 | |
2011-01-27 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-25 | (H02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-17 | (H) Rereferred to H02 | |
2011-01-17 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-17 | (H10) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-11 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H10 | |
2011-01-11 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-12-29 | Bill Number Assigned |